Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Iacobini

Deceased

Bishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Mar 1767BornGenzano
23 Apr 179124.1Ordained PriestPriest
26 Sep 181447.6AppointedBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
30 Oct 181447.7Ordained BishopBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
9 Jun 183265.3DiedBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Iacobini:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Iacobini (born , died ) Bishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea)

  • a priest for 41.1 years
  • a bishop for 17.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 103

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013