Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Salvator dos Reis, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Cranganore (Angamala)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1702³BornSettalcarias, Portugal
2 Oct 175553.5SelectedArchbishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India
19 Jul 175654.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India
5 Feb 175855.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India
7 Apr 177775.0DiedArchbishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Salvator dos Reis:
Archbishop Salvator dos Reis S.J. (born , died ) Archbishop of Cranganore (Angamala)

  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 186
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1758, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 20 Nov 2015