Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raimondo Castelli

Deceased

Bishop of Narni


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Jun 1656AppointedBishop of Narni, Italy
2 Jul 1656Ordained BishopBishop of Narni, Italy
14 Jul 1670DiedBishop of Narni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Raimondo Castelli:
Bishop Raimondo Castelli (died ) Bishop of Narni

  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 119, Number 723
  • Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 252

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013