Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Posilovich, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Duvno

Bishop of Scardona (Skradin)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1597¹BornGlamoch
16 Jun 164245.5AppointedBishop of Scardona (Skradin), Italy
7 Sep 1642³45.7Ordained BishopBishop of Scardona (Skradin), Italy
25 Oct 165558.8AppointedBishop of Duvno, Bosnia and Herzegovina
1657¹60.0DiedBishop of Duvno, Bosnia and Herzegovina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paul Posilovich:
Bishop Paul Posilovich O.F.M. Bishop of Duvno

  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 107, Number 654
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 307, and Page 178

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013