Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonius Serra

Deceased

Bishop of Milos (Melos), Greece


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1610¹Born
14 Jul 164232.5AppointedBishop of Milos (Melos), Greece
7 Sep 164232.6Ordained BishopBishop of Milos (Melos), Greece
Oct 166959.7DiedBishop of Milos (Melos), Greece

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Antonius Serra
Bishop Antonius Serra (born 1610, died Oct 1669) Bishop of Milos (Melos)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChios

  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 107, Number 654
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 241
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1642, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast