Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Dalmazzo (Dalmatico), O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Fossano


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Nov 1648AppointedBishop of Fossano, Italy
29 Nov 1648Ordained BishopBishop of Fossano, Italy
20 Apr 1653DiedBishop of Fossano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola Dalmazzo (Dalmatico):
Bishop Nicola Dalmazzo (Dalmatico) O.S.A. (died ) Bishop of Fossano

  • a bishop for 4.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 112, Number 681
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 190
  • bp/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1648, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015