Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Otto Friedrich von Buchheim (Puchheim)

Deceased

Bishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1604Born
15 Apr 164137.0AppointedBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
21 Apr 164137.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
3 Apr 1664³60.0DiedBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Otto Friedrich von Buchheim (Puchheim) (VIAF: 77374632)
Bishop Otto Friedrich von Buchheim (Puchheim) (born , died ) Bishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWien

  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 213
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 105, Number 639
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1641, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast