Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Federici

Deceased

Bishop of Sagone (Sagona), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1615Born
18 Dec 164934.6Ordained PriestPriest
30 Aug 165540.3AppointedBishop of Sagone (Sagona), France
12 Sep 165540.4Ordained BishopBishop of Sagone (Sagona), France
Aug 1657³42.3DiedBishop of Sagone (Sagona), France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Federici
Bishop Giovanni Battista Federici (born , died Aug 1657) Bishop of Sagone (Sagona)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Spezia
Ordained BishopSant’Agostino, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 7.6 years
  • a bishop for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 118, Number 721
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 300
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1655, Number 24
  • ob: AT, 4 Nov 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast