Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Celestino Bruni (Bruno), O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Boiano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1585¹BornVenice
18 Aug 165368.6AppointedBishop of Boiano, Italy
7 Sep 165368.7Ordained BishopBishop of Boiano, Italy
31 May 166479.4DiedBishop of Boiano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Celestino Bruni (Bruno):
Bishop Celestino Bruni (Bruno) O.S.A. (died ) Bishop of Boiano

  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 116, Number 706
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 117
  • bp/d: CB, 20 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 22 Jul 2014