Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Émile Jean Marie Henri Joseph Destombes, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Phnom-Penh, Cambodia

Titular Bishop of Altava


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1935Born
29 Jun 196125.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of La Société des Missions Etrangères
21 Dec 196126.3Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
14 Apr 199761.6AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Phnom-Penh, Cambodia
14 Apr 199761.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Altava
5 Oct 199762.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Altava
14 Apr 200165.6SucceededVicar Apostolic of Phnom-Penh, Cambodia
1 Oct 201075.1RetiredVicar Apostolic of Phnom-Penh, Cambodia
28 Jan 201680.4DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Phnom-Penh, Cambodia

MicroData Summary for Émile Jean Marie Henri Joseph Destombes
Bishop Émile Jean Marie Henri Joseph Destombes M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Phnom-Penh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoncq, Diocese of Lille, France
Ordained DeaconForeign Missions, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopCentre paroissial, en plein air, Phnom-Penh, Vicariate Apostolic of Phnom-Penh
Death PlacePhnom-Penh, Vicariate Apostolic of Phnom-Penh

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Oct 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,154
  • d: CB, 28 Jan 2016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)
  • od/c0/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 7 Jul 2018

Quantcast