Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francisco de Paula Cardinal Benavides y Navarrete, O.S. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Zaragoza, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1810Born
1834¹23.6Ordained PriestPriest
23 Sep 185747.3SelectedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
21 Dec 185747.6ConfirmedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
14 Mar 185847.8Ordained BishopBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
4 Jun 187565.0SelectedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain
21 Jun 187565.1ResignedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
5 Jul 187565.1ConfirmedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain
12 Mar 187766.8Elevated to Cardinal
25 Jun 187767.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Tommaso in Parione
28 Feb 187968.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio
13 May 188170.9AppointedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
30 Mar 189584.8DiedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Paula Benavides y Navarrete (VIAF: 305871970)
Francisco de Paula Cardinal Benavides y Navarrete O.S. (born , died ) Archbishop of Zaragoza

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalace of Jabalquinto, Baeza, Diocese of Jaén
Ordained BishopSeñoras Comendadoras de Santiago, Church, Madrid
Death PlaceZaragoza, Archdiocese of Zaragoza
Buried Place (Original)Our Lady of El Pilar, Basilica, Zaragoza, Archdiocese of Zaragoza

  • a priest for 61.2 years
  • a bishop for 37.0 years
  • a cardinal for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Mar 1877
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 166, and Page 321
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 510, and Page 52
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 53
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 165, Number 906
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1858, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Mar 2017