Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
8 Nov 1967 | Born | ||
16 Sep 2000 | 32.8 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Chilaw, Sri Lanka |
5 Mar 2024 | 56.3 | Appointed | Bishop of Ratnapura, Sri Lanka |
1 Jun 2024 | 56.5 | Ordained Bishop | Bishop of Ratnapura, Sri Lanka |
3 Jun 2024 | 56.5 | Installed | Bishop of Ratnapura, Sri Lanka |
(WikiData: Q124742428)
Father
Peter Antony Wyman
Croos
(born )
Bishop-Elect
of Ratnapura
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Chilaw, Diocese of Chilaw |
Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Ratnapura.
|
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 27 Mar 2024 |
✠