Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manuel Antonio Arboleda y Scarpetta, C.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of PopayŠn, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1870Born
5 Aug 189424.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
18 Apr 190737.1AppointedArchbishop of PopayŠn, Colombia
29 Jun 190737.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of PopayŠn, Colombia
31 Mar 192353.0DiedArchbishop of PopayŠn, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Manuel Antonio Arboleda y Scarpetta
Archbishop Manuel Antonio Arboleda y Scarpetta C.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of PopayŠn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCartago

  • a priest for 28.6 years
  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,921
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations …piscopales, Issue 1,907, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast