Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Florencio Coronado Romani, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Huancavélica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1908BornCaja Espíritu
8 Sep 193325.2ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
23 Sep 193830.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
1 Mar 195647.7AppointedBishop of Huancavélica, Peru
22 Apr 195647.9Ordained BishopBishop of Huancavélica, Peru
14 Jan 198273.6RetiredBishop of Huancavélica, Peru
25 Feb 200697.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Huancavélica, Peru

MicroData Summary for Florencio Coronado Romani:
Bishop Florencio Coronado Romani C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Huancavélica

  • a priest for 67.4 years
  • a bishop for 49.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 28
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015