Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Signani, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1804Born
1 Oct 182622.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
28 Sep 185551.4AppointedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
14 Oct 185551.5Ordained BishopBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
2 Sep 186359.4DiedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Signani (VIAF: 307403451)
Bishop Lorenzo Signani O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Nepi e Sutri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrisighella
Ordained BishopImm. Conception (OFM Cap), Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 36.9 years
  • a bishop for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 409
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1855, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017