Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Colin Campbell

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Antigonish, Nova Scotia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1931BornAntigonish
26 May 195624.8Ordained PriestPriest of Halifax, Nova Scotia, Canada
12 Dec 198655.4AppointedBishop of Antigonish, Nova Scotia, Canada
19 Mar 198755.6Ordained BishopBishop of Antigonish, Nova Scotia, Canada
26 Oct 200271.2ResignedBishop of Antigonish, Nova Scotia, Canada
17 Jan 201280.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Antigonish, Nova Scotia, Canada

MicroData Summary for Colin Campbell:
Bishop Colin Campbell (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Antigonish

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 18 Jan 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015