Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste de la Croix Chevrière de St. Vallier

Deceased

Bishop of Québec


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1653BornGrenoble, France
1675²21.1Ordained PriestPriest
Apr 168531.3SelectedBishop of Québec, Canada
7 Jul 168733.6ConfirmedBishop of Québec, Canada
25 Jan 168834.1Ordained BishopBishop of Québec, Canada
26 Dec 172774.1DiedBishop of Québec, Canada

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste de la Croix Chevrière de St. Vallier:
Bishop Jean-Baptiste de la Croix Chevrière de St. Vallier (born , died ) Bishop of Québec

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 39.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 326
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1688, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 20 May 2015