Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcel Olivier Maradan, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Port Victoria o Seychelles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1899BornEcuvillens
28 Mar 192525.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
17 Jun 193737.6AppointedBishop of Port Victoria o Seychelles
6 Dec 193738.1Ordained BishopBishop of Port Victoria o Seychelles
6 Oct 197272.9ResignedBishop of Port Victoria o Seychelles
5 Feb 197575.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Port Victoria o Seychelles

MicroData Summary for Marcel Olivier Maradan:
Bishop Marcel Olivier Maradan O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Port Victoria o Seychelles

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 37.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1937, Number 83

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015