Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Eduardo Cervantes Merino

Bishop of Orizaba, Veracruz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1953 BornMexico City
25 Dec 197825.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Tuxpan, Veracruz, México
24 Mar 197925.4Ordained PriestPriest of Tuxpan, Veracruz, México
2 Feb 201561.3AppointedBishop of Orizaba, Veracruz, México
23 Apr 201561.5Ordained BishopBishop of Orizaba, Veracruz, México
24 Apr 201561.5InstalledBishop of Orizaba, Veracruz, México

MicroData Summary for Francisco Eduardo Cervantes Merino:
Bishop Francisco Eduardo Cervantes Merino (born ) Bishop of Orizaba

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Orizaba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2015
  • od/c01/bp: CB, 2 Feb 2015
  • ob: CB, 8 Feb 2015
  • c2: CB, 2 Mar 2015
  • i: CB, 19 Apr 2015
  • c34: CB, 22 Apr 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,481

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015