Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Capitoli

Deceased

Bishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Apr 1909AppointedBishop of Termoli, Italy
16 May 1909Ordained BishopBishop of Termoli, Italy
14 Feb 1911AppointedBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
23 Aug 1911DiedBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Capitoli
Bishop Giovanni Capitoli (died ) Bishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTodi, Diocese of Todi
Ordained BishopVilla Lanti, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 2.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1912
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 366, and Page 78
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1909, Number 23
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,900

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast