Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Calixto Castrillo y Ornedo

Deceased

Bishop of León


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1804BornBelorado
23 Dec 186157.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
23 Dec 186157.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Doliche
23 Mar 186257.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Doliche
29 Apr 186358.5SelectedBishop of León, Spain
1 Oct 186359.0ConfirmedBishop of León, Spain
19 Sep 186964.9DiedBishop of León, Spain

MicroData Summary for Calixto Castrillo y Ornedo:
Bishop Calixto Castrillo y Ornedo (born , died ) Bishop of León

  • a bishop for 7.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 248, and Page 336
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 168, Number 927

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Oct 2013