Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mariano Brezmes y Arredondo

Deceased

Bishop of Astorga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1805BornMarne
1829¹23.3Ordained PriestPriest
2 May 186660.7SelectedBishop of Guadix, Spain
25 Jun 186660.8ConfirmedBishop of Guadix, Spain
30 Sep 186661.1Ordained BishopBishop of Guadix, Spain
23 Jul 187569.9SelectedBishop of Astorga, Spain
17 Sep 187570.0ConfirmedBishop of Astorga, Spain
11 Nov 188580.2DiedBishop of Astorga, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mariano Brezmes y Arredondo:
Bishop Mariano Brezmes y Arredondo (born , died ) Bishop of Astorga

  • a priest for 56.9 years
  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 128, and Page 294
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 173, Number 954

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Oct 2013