Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Plácido Bailés (Baylés) y Padilla, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Plasencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1682BornAntequera
3 Mar 173855.4AppointedBishop of Huesca, Spain
3 Jun 173855.7Ordained BishopBishop of Huesca, Spain
26 Nov 174260.1AppointedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
22 Jan 174764.3DiedBishop of Plasencia, Spain

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Plácido Bailés (Baylés) y Padilla:
Bishop Plácido Bailés (Baylés) y Padilla O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Plasencia

  • a bishop for 8.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 56, Number 246
  • ob/d: CB, 23 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Aug 2014