Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Cárdenas Aregullín

Bishop Emeritus of Papantla, Puebla


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1937 BornCiudad Victoria
29 Jun 196225.2Ordained PriestPriest
17 Mar 197840.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tehuacán, Puebla, México
17 Mar 197840.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Crepedula
7 May 197841.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Crepedula
30 Oct 198043.6AppointedBishop of Papantla, Puebla, México
2 May 201275.1RetiredBishop of Papantla, Puebla, México

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Cárdenas Aregullín:
Bishop Lorenzo Cárdenas Aregullín (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Papantla

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Papantla.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 2 May 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015