Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Bucci

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Orthosias in Caria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1717Born
1740¹22.8Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 178265.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Orthosias in Caria
1 Jun 178366.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Orthosias in Caria
4 Jan 1790³72.8DiedTitular Bishop of Orthosias in Caria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Bucci
Bishop Antonio Bucci (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Orthosias in Caria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrottaglie, Archdiocese of Taranto, Italy
Ordained BishopCathedral, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
Death PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 6.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 320
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1783, Number 10
  • c34/loc: AT, 25 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 26 Jun 2018

Quantcast