Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pasquale Sifanni

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Tium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1727³BornNapoli, Italy
5 Jun 175123.7Ordained PriestPriest
27 Feb 179264.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tium
18 Mar 179264.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tium

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pasquale Sifanni
Bishop Pasquale Sifanni (born ) Titular Bishop of Tium

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 406
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016