Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Rossi

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Nicosia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1732Born
15 Mar 175523.0Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 179159.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicosia
22 Jan 179259.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nicosia
13 Feb 179764.9DiedTitular Archbishop of Nicosia

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Rossi
Archbishop Giuseppe Rossi (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Nicosia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
Ordained BishopRoyal Palace, Chapel, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
Death PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

  • a priest for 41.9 years
  • a bishop for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 310
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 84
  • b/c2+: AT, 12 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 28 Jun 2018

Quantcast