Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriele Maria Genghi

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Dura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1735BornNapoli, Italy
29 Jan 179862.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Dura
18 Mar 179862.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dura

MicroData Summary for Gabriele Maria Genghi
Bishop Gabriele Maria Genghi (born ) Titular Bishop of Dura

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 203
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1798, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 11 Mar 2016