Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Ventapane

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Tium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1751Born
24 Sep 177423.3Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
10 Jun 179847.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tium
12 Aug 179847.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tium
Jul 1830³79.1DiedTitular Bishop of Tium

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico Ventapane
Bishop Domenico Ventapane (born , died Jul 1830) Titular Bishop of Tium

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
Ordained BishopCathedral, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
Death PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Concezione a Materdei, Church, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

  • a priest for 55.7 years
  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 406
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1798, Number 32
  • c34: AT, 27 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 28 Jun 2018

Quantcast