Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Segundo Garcia de Sierra y Méndez

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Burgos, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1908Born
24 Jun 193123.0Ordained PriestPriest of Oviedo, Spain
28 Jul 195446.1AppointedBishop of Barbastro, Spain
14 Nov 195446.4Ordained BishopBishop of Barbastro, Spain
20 Nov 195951.4AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Oviedo, Spain
20 Nov 195951.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Parium
7 Feb 196455.6AppointedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
19 Oct 198375.3RetiredArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
30 Oct 199890.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Burgos, Spain

MicroData Summary for Segundo Garcia de Sierra y Méndez
Archbishop Segundo Garcia de Sierra y Méndez (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Burgos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceS. Martin de Mohias

  • a priest for 67.3 years
  • a bishop for 43.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast