Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Atanasio Amisse Canira

Bishop of Lichinga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1962 BornMossoril
12 Dec 199331.6Ordained PriestPriest of Nacala, Mozambique
8 Feb 201552.7AppointedBishop of Lichinga, Mozambique
22 Mar 201552.8Ordained BishopBishop of Lichinga, Mozambique

MicroData Summary for Atanasio Amisse Canira:
Bishop Atanasio Amisse Canira (born ) Bishop of Lichinga

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lichinga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Feb 2015
  • ob: CB, 21 Feb 2015
  • c2+: CB, 23 Mar 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,393

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015