Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovani Carlos Caldas Barroca

Bishop of Uruaçu (Uruassu), Goias, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1969 Born
3 Dec 199425.8Ordained PriestPriest of Brasília, Distrito Federal, Brazil
17 Jun 202051.3AppointedBishop of Uruaçu (Uruassu), Goias, Brazil
5 Sep 202051.5Ordained BishopBishop of Uruaçu (Uruassu), Goias, Brazil
12 Sep 202051.5InstalledBishop of Uruaçu (Uruassu), Goias, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Giovani Carlos Caldas Barroca
Bishop Giovani Carlos Caldas Barroca (born ) Bishop of Uruaçu (Uruassu)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrasília, Archdiocese of Brasília, Distrito Federal
Ordained BishopNossa Senhora Aparecida, Cathedral, Brasília, Archdiocese of Brasília, Distrito Federal

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Uruaçu (Uruassu).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Jun 2020
  • ob/i: CB, 17 Jun 2020
  • c2: CB, 10 Jul 2020
  • fn: CB, 1 Sep 2020
  • c34: CB, 4 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 21 Sep 2020

Quantcast