Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Robert Sanchez

Auxiliary Bishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA

Titular Bishop of Coeliana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1946 Born
17 Dec 197125.0Ordained PriestPriest of Brooklyn, New York, USA
2 May 201265.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA
2 May 201265.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Coeliana
11 Jul 201265.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Coeliana

MicroData Summary for Paul Robert Sanchez
Bishop Paul Robert Sanchez (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Brooklyn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrooklyn

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Brooklyn.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 May 2012
  • ob/c2: CB, 2 May 2012
  • c1: Website of the Diocese, 2 May 2012
  • c34: CB, 9 Jul 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,499

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast