Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Boßmann (Bossmann)

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Münster

Titular Bishop of Dioclea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1797BornKeppeln
23 May 182123.7Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
25 Jun 185860.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
25 Jun 185860.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Dioclea
25 Jul 185860.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dioclea
4 Aug 187577.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johannes Boßmann (Bossmann):
Bishop Johannes Boßmann (Bossmann) (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Münster

  • a priest for 54.2 years
  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 246

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013