Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel McDonnell

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Trinidad, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles

Titular Bishop of Olympus (Olimpus)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1785Born
7 Apr 181024.5Ordained PriestPriest
23 Dec 182843.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Trinidad, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles
23 Dec 182843.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Olympus (Olimpus)
25 Mar 182943.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Olympus (Olimpus)
26 Oct 184459.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Trinidad, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Daniel McDonnell
Bishop Daniel McDonnell (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Trinidad

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLondon, Great Britain

  • a priest for 34.5 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 291
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1829, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 May 2017