Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Carlos Brandão Cabral

Bishop of Almenara, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1963 BornTupã
12 Mar 199329.7Ordained PriestPriest of Limeira, Sao Paulo, Brazil
19 Jun 201350.0AppointedBishop of Almenara, Minas Gerais, Brazil
15 Sep 201350.2Ordained BishopBishop of Almenara, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Carlos Brandão Cabral:
Bishop José Carlos Brandão Cabral (born ) Bishop of Almenara

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Almenara.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Jun 2013
  • ob/c2+: CB, 29 Aug 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,871

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015