Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Reginaldo Andrietta

Bishop of Jales, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1957 BornPirassununga
18 Mar 198326.0Ordained PriestPriest of Limeira, Sao Paulo, Brazil
21 Oct 201558.6AppointedBishop of Jales, Sao Paulo, Brazil
27 Dec 201558.8Ordained BishopBishop of Jales, Sao Paulo, Brazil
31 Jan 201658.8InstalledBishop of Jales, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Reginaldo Andrietta
Bishop José Reginaldo Andrietta (born ) Bishop of Jales

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Jales.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Oct 2015
  • ob/i: CB, 24 Oct 2015
  • c2+: CB, 5 Dec 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,695

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 20 Jul 2016