Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop János Karl Von Maltzan

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Győr (Raab)

Titular Bishop of Leontopolis in Bithynia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1693³BornEisenach
19 Dec 171623.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
20 Feb 171723.5Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jan 174349.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
28 Jan 174349.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Leontopolis in Bithynia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for János Karl Von Maltzan:
Bishop János Karl Von Maltzan (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Győr (Raab)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 259, and Page 453
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1743, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015