Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Marie-Henri-Joseph Bigolet, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}

Titular Bishop of Antiphrae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1872BornCusey, France
16 Sep 189018.2ProfessedMember of La Société des Missions Etrangères
21 Sep 189523.2Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
27 Jun 191138.9AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}, Viet Nam
27 Jun 191138.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Antiphrae
12 Nov 191139.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Antiphrae
23 May 192350.8DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Louis-Marie-Henri-Joseph Bigolet:
Bishop Louis-Marie-Henri-Joseph Bigolet M.E.P. (born , died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}

  • a priest for 27.7 years
  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 59
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 90

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013