Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Críspulo Benítez Fontúrvel

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Barquisimeto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1905BornPorlamar
14 Jul 192924.2Ordained PriestPriest
21 Oct 194944.5AppointedBishop of Barquisimeto, Venezuela
13 Nov 194944.6Ordained BishopBishop of Barquisimeto, Venezuela
30 Apr 196661.0AppointedArchbishop of Barquisimeto, Venezuela
18 Oct 198277.5RetiredArchbishop of Barquisimeto, Venezuela
1 May 199186.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Barquisimeto, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Críspulo Benítez Fontúrvel:
Archbishop Críspulo Benítez Fontúrvel (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Barquisimeto

  • a priest for 61.8 years
  • a bishop for 41.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 102

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013