Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Onofrio Hodierna

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Valva

Titular Bishop of Berytus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1643¹BornNapoli
20 Jan 166926.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
27 Jan 166926.0Ordained PriestPriest
24 Apr 168441.3AppointedBishop of Bitetto, Italy
4 Jan 171774.0AppointedBishop of Valva, Italy
4 Jan 171774.0AppointedBishop of Sulmona, Italy
6 Mar 172784.1ResignedBishop of Valva, Italy
6 Mar 172784.1ResignedBishop of Sulmona, Italy
17 Mar 172784.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Berytus

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Onofrio Hodierna:
Bishop Francesco Onofrio Hodierna (born 1643) Bishop Emeritus of Valva

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 119, and Page 120
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 404
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1684, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 22 Apr 2015