Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mikhayl Assaf

Deceased

Archbishop of Petra e Filadelfia (Melkite Greek), Jordan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1887Born
20 Jul 191224.7Ordained PriestPriest
1948²60.1AppointedPatriarchal Vicar of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme} (Melkite Greek), Palestine
19 Sep 194860.8AppointedArchbishop of Petra e Filadelfia (Melkite Greek), Jordan
10 Oct 194860.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Petra e Filadelfia (Melkite Greek), Jordan
10 Aug 197082.7DiedArchbishop of Petra e Filadelfia (Melkite Greek), Jordan

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mikhayl Assaf
Archbishop Mikhayl Assaf (born , died ) Archbishop of Petra e Filadelfia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDamas

  • a priest for 58.0 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 108

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast