Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hendrik Theodorus Edmund Beel

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Roermond

Titular Bishop of Sucarda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1910BornRoermond
28 Mar 193625.5Ordained PriestPriest of Roermond, Netherlands
30 Aug 196554.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Roermond, Netherlands
30 Aug 196554.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Sucarda
29 Dec 196555.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sucarda
20 Jan 197261.3ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Roermond, Netherlands
16 Jun 199685.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Roermond, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Hendrik Theodorus Edmund Beel:
Bishop Hendrik Theodorus Edmund Beel (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Roermond

  • a priest for 60.2 years
  • a bishop for 30.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013