Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Anton Friedrich Baudri

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

Titular Bishop of Arethusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1804Born
26 Apr 182723.1Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
28 Sep 184945.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
28 Sep 184945.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Arethusa
24 Feb 185046.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arethusa
29 Jun 189389.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Anton Friedrich Baudri (VIAF: 15566410)
Bishop Johann Anton Friedrich Baudri (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceElberfeld, Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}

  • a priest for 66.1 years
  • a bishop for 43.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 119
  • c34: ATh
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,643
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1850, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017