Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Damase Zinga Atangana

Bishop of Kribi, Cameroon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1964 Born
25 Jul 199227.6Ordained PriestPriest of Obala, Cameroon
7 Nov 201550.9AppointedBishop of Kribi, Cameroon
8 Dec 201550.9Ordained BishopBishop of Kribi, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Damase Zinga Atangana
Bishop Damase Zinga Atangana (born ) Bishop of Kribi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNkog Bong

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kribi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Nov 2015
  • ob: CB, 9 Nov 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,684

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast