Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Batistela, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bom Jesus da Lapa, Baia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1931BornCerquilho
25 Jan 195725.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
18 Apr 199058.6AppointedBishop of Bom Jesus da Lapa, Baia, Brazil
1 Jul 199058.8Ordained BishopBishop of Bom Jesus da Lapa, Baia, Brazil
28 Jan 200977.3RetiredBishop of Bom Jesus da Lapa, Baia, Brazil
20 Oct 201079.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Bom Jesus da Lapa, Baia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Francisco Batistela:
Bishop Francisco Batistela C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bom Jesus da Lapa

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Jan 2009
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124, Number 11,187
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013