Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Carrasco Rouco

Bishop of Lugo, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1956 Born
8 Apr 198528.4Ordained PriestPriest of Mondoñedo-Ferrol, Spain
30 Nov 200751.1AppointedBishop of Lugo, Spain
9 Feb 200851.3Ordained BishopBishop of Lugo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Carrasco Rouco
Bishop Alfonso Carrasco Rouco (born ) Bishop of Lugo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillalba

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lugo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Nov 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,673

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018