Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Battista Cardinal Deti

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1580Born
3 Mar 159919.0Elevated to Cardinal
17 Mar 159919.0InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro
15 Dec 159919.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
28 Feb 160525.0Ordained DeaconCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
1 Apr 160727.1Ordained PriestPriest
6 Oct 161434.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro
7 Jun 162343.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
24 Jun 162343.3Ordained BishopBishop of Albano
2 Mar 162646.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
9 Sep 162646.5AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
13 Jul 163050.4DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Deti (VIAF: 37788996)
Giovanni Battista Cardinal Deti (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFerrara, Diocese of Ferrara, Italy
Ordained PriestSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Silvestro al Quirinale, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Aldobrandini chapel, Santa Maria sopra Minerva, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 23.2 years
  • a bishop for 7.0 years
  • a cardinal for 31.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 3 Mar 1599
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 6
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 80, Number 474
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1623, Number 26
  • od/c0: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • c1: AT, 19 May 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 20 May 2017