Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Orazio Capponi

Deceased

Bishop of Carpentras, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1552¹Born
23 Sep 159644.7AppointedBishop of Carpentras, France
29 Sep 159644.7Ordained PriestPriest
28 Oct 159644.8Ordained BishopBishop of Carpentras, France
1615¹63.0ResignedBishop of Carpentras, France
30 Mar 162270.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Carpentras, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Orazio Capponi (VIAF: 88699405)
Bishop Orazio Capponi (born 1552, died ) Bishop of Carpentras

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
Ordained BishopS. Jean des Florentins, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 25.5 years
  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 136
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1596, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast