Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agostino Solaro di Moretta

Deceased

Bishop of Fossano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1570¹BornMorettae Taurinen
29 Mar 162151.2AppointedBishop of Fossano, Italy
13 Apr 162151.2Ordained BishopBishop of Fossano, Italy
162555.0SelectedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
18 Jun 162555.4DiedBishop of Fossano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Agostino Solaro di Moretta:
Bishop Agostino Solaro di Moretta (died ) Bishop of Fossano

  • a bishop for 4.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 190, and Page 302
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 71, Number 413
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1621, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 18 Feb 2015